Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/03/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/03/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/08/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/24/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/28/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/20/1994