Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/03/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/16/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/21/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/21/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/21/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/11/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/11/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/19/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/28/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/28/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/22/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/19/1994