Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 02/08/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/19/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/12/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/13/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/18/1994