Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/08/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 02/08/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/10/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/10/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/23/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/02/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/02/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/02/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/02/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/02/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/02/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/11/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/11/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/22/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/26/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/26/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/19/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/04/1994