Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/09/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/09/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/09/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/09/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/09/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/09/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/09/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/09/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/09/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/12/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/26/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 05/26/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/26/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/26/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/12/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/21/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/07/1994