Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/10/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 02/10/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/10/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/23/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/02/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/02/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/08/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/04/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/04/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/07/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew