There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide certain employee protection benefits for railroad employees.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/04/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/11/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (150)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/15/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/15/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/15/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/15/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/15/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/15/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/15/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/15/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/15/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/16/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1994
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/16/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/16/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/16/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/21/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/21/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/23/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/23/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/23/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/23/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/02/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/02/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 05/02/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/02/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/11/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/25/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/25/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/25/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/25/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/13/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/13/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 07/28/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/03/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/06/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/11/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials03/04/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3866.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3866. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/1994)

Amends the Interstate Commerce Act to direct the Interstate Commerce Commission (ICC) to require a fair and equitable arrangement for protection of the interests of railroad employees who may be affected by an ICC order approving an application for construction or acquisition and operation of a railroad line. Requires such arrangement to be no less fair and beneficial to the interests of such employees than those established under specified provisions for employee protective arrangements in transactions involving rail carriers.