Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/15/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/15/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/15/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/15/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/15/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/15/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/15/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/15/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/15/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/16/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1994
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/16/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/16/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/16/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/21/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/21/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/23/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/23/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/23/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/23/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/02/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/02/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 05/02/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/02/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/11/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/25/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/25/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/25/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/25/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/13/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/13/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 07/28/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/03/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/06/1994