Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 02/22/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/18/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/04/1994