Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/22/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/23/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/28/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/28/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/28/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/28/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 07/25/1994