Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/03/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/03/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/10/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/21/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/21/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/23/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/05/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/05/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/05/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/05/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/05/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/05/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/05/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/05/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/05/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/05/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/05/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/05/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/05/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/05/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 05/05/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/05/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/05/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 05/05/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/05/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/18/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/18/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/18/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/18/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/09/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/09/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/09/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/09/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/17/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/17/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 06/17/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 06/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/29/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/14/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 07/14/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/14/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/26/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/19/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 08/19/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/07/1994