There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Opal Creek Forest Preserve Act of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

Opal Creek Forest Preserve Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment and management of the Opal Creek Forest Preserve in the State of Oregon.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
08/08/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/08/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 103-683, Part II.
08/08/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-683, Part I.
02/24/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
10/05/1994SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
08/10/1994SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
08/09/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
08/08/1994-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/08/1994-4:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/08/1994-4:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7151-7153)
08/08/1994-4:18pmHouseMr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/08/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
08/08/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 103-683, Part II.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/08/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-683, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/05/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/05/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/05/1994HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/02/1994HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
07/13/1994HouseSubcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/13/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/13/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/25/1994HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/18/1994HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources
04/27/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/28/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/24/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/24/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
02/24/1994HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E252)
02/24/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/07/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/07/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/07/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/07/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/07/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/07/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/07/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/07/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/07/1994
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/07/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/07/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/07/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/07/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/07/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/07/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/07/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/07/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/07/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/07/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/07/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/07/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/07/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/07/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/07/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/07/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/07/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/11/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/11/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/03/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/03/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 08/03/1994

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/24/1994 Referred to
07/13/1994 Markup by
08/08/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-683 Part 2
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources02/28/1994 Referred to
05/18/1994 Hearings by
07/13/1994 Discharged from
House Natural Resources02/24/1994 Referred to
08/05/1994 Markup by
08/08/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-683 Part 1
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands04/27/1994 Referred to
08/02/1994 Hearings by
08/05/1994 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources08/09/1994 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests08/10/1994 Referred to
10/05/1994 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3905. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/08/1994)

Opal Creek Forest Preserve Act of 1994 - Establishes the Opal Creek Forest Preserve consisting of Federal lands in the Willamette and Mt. Hood National Forests, Oregon.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to prepare a Preserve management plan.

Prohibits, with specified exceptions: (1) mining, mineral, and geothermal leasing or dispositions; (2) logging or other timber harvesting; (3) off road motorized travel; and (4) road construction and the use of specified existing roads.

Authorizes the Secretary to acquire private lands within the Preserve.