Committees: H.R.3905 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/24/1994 Referred to
07/13/1994 Markup by
08/08/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-683 Part 2
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources02/28/1994 Referred to
05/18/1994 Hearings by
07/13/1994 Discharged from
House Natural Resources02/24/1994 Referred to
08/05/1994 Markup by
08/08/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-683 Part 1
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands04/27/1994 Referred to
08/02/1994 Hearings by
08/05/1994 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources08/09/1994 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests08/10/1994 Referred to
10/05/1994 Hearings by