Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/24/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/24/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/16/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/16/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/03/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/26/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/27/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/29/1994