There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Nuclear Facilities Licensing and Regulation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the licensing of all new Federal nuclear facilities by the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, and to establish a Federal Nuclear Facilities Regulatory Review Commission to recommend an approach to subjecting existing Federal nuclear facilities to independent regulation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
04/26/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/26/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/22/1994Executive Comment Received from DOE.
03/08/1994Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
03/04/1994Executive Comment Requested from DOE.
03/04/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Acquisition.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/02/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
03/01/1994Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
03/01/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E287-288)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1994Late Referral to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources (Apr 27, 94).
02/28/1994Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1994Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1994Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/28/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 02/28/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/1994

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/28/1994 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Acquisition03/04/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/28/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power04/26/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials04/26/1994 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/28/1994 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/08/1994 Hearings by
House Science, Space and Technology02/28/1994 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Energy03/02/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3920.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3920. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: NRC Licensing of New Department of Energy

Nuclear Facilities

Title II: Federal Nuclear Facilities Regulatory Review

Commission

Federal Nuclear Facilities Licensing and Regulation Act - Title I: NRC Licensing of New Department of Energy Nuclear Facilities - Amends the Energy Reorganization Act of 1974 to mandate that any new Department of Energy (DOE) nuclear facilities comply with the licensing requirements imposed by the Nuclear Regulatory Commission.

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to promulgate standards for the protection of the public health and safety and the environment from radioactive releases from new DOE nuclear facilities.

Title II: Federal Nuclear Facilities Regulatory Review Commission - Establishes the Federal Nuclear Facilities Regulatory Review Commission to recommend to the Congress an approach to subjecting existing DOE nuclear facilities to independent regulation, after taking into account specified issues.

Authorizes appropriations.