Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/10/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/10/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/20/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/17/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/17/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/17/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/17/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/17/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/22/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 07/22/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/22/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/05/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew