Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/03/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/03/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/09/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/09/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/09/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/09/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/11/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/16/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/16/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/21/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/21/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/22/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/24/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/24/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/13/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/18/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/19/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/19/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/20/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/02/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/02/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/03/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/03/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/05/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/11/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 05/18/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/18/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/18/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/18/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/18/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/18/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/26/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/13/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/22/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/13/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/13/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/21/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/29/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/18/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/19/1994