Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/18/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/28/1994