Text: H.R.3969 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/1994)

 
[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 3969 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 3969

  To amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act to 
  provide State, Federal, and Tribal agencies with sufficient time to 
         implement certain pesticide safety training programs.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 8, 1994

   Mr. Boehner (for himself, Mr. Roberts, Mr. Stenholm, Mr. Smith of 
Oregon, Mr. Combest, Mr. Darden, Mr. Kingston, Mr. Emerson, Mr. Bishop, 
  Mr. DeLay, Mr. Tejeda, Mr. McCrery, Mr. Livingston, Mr. Barlow, Mr. 
  Linder, Mr. Taylor of North Carolina, Mr. Parker, Mr. Baesler, Mr. 
Hansen, Ms. Danner, Mr. Poshard, Mr. Lancaster, Mr. Bonilla, Mr. Crapo, 
   Mr. Bunning, Mr. Wilson, Mr. Doolittle, Mr. Minge, Mr. Ewing, Mr. 
Hayes, Mr. Hoagland, Mr. Baker of Louisiana, Mr. Oxley, and Ms. Kaptur) 
 introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on 
                              Agriculture

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
  To amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act to 
  provide State, Federal, and Tribal agencies with sufficient time to 
         implement certain pesticide safety training programs.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. AMENDMENT OF FIFRA.

    Section 25 of the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide 
Act (7 U.S.C. 136w) is amended by adding the following at the end 
thereof:
    ``(f) Compliance Date for Standard.--The April 15, 1994 compliance 
date for provisions of the regulations under this Act referred to in 40 
C.F.R. 170.5(c) (57 Fed. Reg. 38152, Aug. 21, 1992) shall be extended 
to October 23, 1995. By April 23, 1995, the Administrator of the 
Environmental Protection Agency shall develop and distribute pesticide 
safety training materials that convey, at a minimum, the information 
set forth in 40 C.F.R. 170-230(c)(4) (57 Fed. Reg. 38162 Aug. 21, 1992) 
and assist the appropriate State, Federal, and Tribal agencies in 
implementing pesticide safety training programs.
    ``(g) Labeling Requirements.--The effective date for the labeling 
statement required under amendments to the regulations under this Act 
published in the Federal Register on August 21, 1992 shall be extended 
to October 23, 1995 in lieu of the April 21, 1994 effective date set 
forth in 40 C.F.R. 156.200(c)(3) (57 Fed. Reg. Aug. 21, 1992).''.

                                 <all>