Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/09/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/11/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/11/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/11/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/11/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/16/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/21/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/21/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/14/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 05/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/01/1994