Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/09/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/19/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 07/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/21/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/28/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/12/1994