There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Urban Recreation and At-Risk Youth Act of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

Urban Recreation and At-Risk Youth Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Urban Park and Recreation Recovery Act of 1978 to authorize grants for the expansion of recreation opportunities for at risk youth in urban areas with a high prevalence of crime, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/22/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 59 (Roll no. 82).
03/21/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-444.
03/15/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/19/1994SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
05/05/1994SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
03/24/1994SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/23/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/22/1994-6:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/22/1994-6:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 59 (Roll no. 82).
03/22/1994-6:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1839)
03/21/1994-1:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until March 21.
03/21/1994-1:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/21/1994-1:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1619-1624)
03/21/1994-1:16pmHouseMr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/21/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-444.
03/21/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
03/16/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/15/1994HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E433)
03/15/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/15/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 03/15/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/15/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/17/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/17/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/17/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/17/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/21/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/21/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 03/21/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/21/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/15/1994 Referred to
03/16/1994 Markup by
03/21/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-444
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/23/1994 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/24/1994 Referred to
05/19/1994 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4034.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/22/1994)

Urban Recreation and At-Risk Youth Act of 1994 - Amends the Urban Park and Recreation Recovery Act of 1978 to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to provide, through the urban park and recreation recovery program, at-risk youth recreation grants in neighborhoods and communities with a high prevalence of crime, particularly violent crime or crime committed by youth, for purposes including the provision of lighting, emergency phones, or other capital improvements for the security of urban parks. Directs the Secretary to give grant priority to local government programs meeting specified criteria, including: (1) targeting youth at the greatest risk of becoming involved in violence and crime; (2) teaching important values and life skills; (3) offering education and counseling in addition to recreation opportunities; and (4) showing the greatest potential of being continued with non-Federal funds or serving as models.

Requires local governments, to be eligible for such grants, to include strategies to reduce crime and juvenile delinquency in their five-year action programs for park and recreation recovery.

Requires no more than 25 percent of Federal grant funds made available under such Act to be used for program support.

Repeals provisions limiting the duration of the urban park and recreation recovery program to five years.