Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/16/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/16/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/17/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/18/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/18/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/21/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/20/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/20/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/20/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/20/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/20/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/03/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/03/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/04/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/11/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/17/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/17/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/19/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/08/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/08/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/09/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/13/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/13/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/27/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/29/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/30/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/12/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/14/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/21/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/27/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/03/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 08/09/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/09/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/10/1994