Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/18/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/18/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 04/18/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/18/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/18/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/26/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/26/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/03/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/03/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/03/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/03/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/12/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/23/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/23/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/13/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/13/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/13/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/13/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/25/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/25/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/02/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/20/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/20/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/06/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/06/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/07/1994