Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/23/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/23/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/23/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/23/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/23/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/23/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/24/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/24/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/24/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/24/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/24/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/24/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/24/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/24/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/24/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/12/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/12/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 04/14/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/14/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/14/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/19/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/19/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/19/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/19/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/19/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/19/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/19/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 05/25/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/25/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/25/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/25/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 05/25/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/10/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/10/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/10/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/10/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/17/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/17/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/17/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/17/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/17/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/17/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 06/17/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/17/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/17/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/17/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/27/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/27/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/27/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/27/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/27/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/13/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/13/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/13/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/13/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/13/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/13/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/19/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/02/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/02/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/02/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/16/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/16/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/16/1994