Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/13/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/13/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/13/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/04/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/04/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/04/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/04/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/11/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/11/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/11/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/11/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/11/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/11/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/19/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/19/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/19/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/09/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/17/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/17/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/17/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/17/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/30/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/30/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/19/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/19/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 08/04/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/04/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/04/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/04/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/04/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/09/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/09/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/09/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/09/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/04/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/04/1994