Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/17/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 03/17/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/18/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 04/12/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/26/1994