Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/17/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/08/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/12/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/26/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/26/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/26/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/26/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/19/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/19/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/19/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/19/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/19/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/19/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/1994