Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/24/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/24/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/13/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 04/14/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/14/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/20/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/28/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/28/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/28/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/05/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/05/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/18/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/18/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/18/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/18/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/19/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/19/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/25/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/09/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/09/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/27/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/12/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/18/1994