Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/23/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/19/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/19/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/19/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/19/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/19/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/19/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/19/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/19/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/19/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/19/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/04/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/04/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/04/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/08/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/08/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/08/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/08/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/09/1994