There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Credit and Development Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide needed credit and financial services to rural residents, public services, and business enterprises, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/21/1994Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Environment, Credit and Rural Development
03/31/1994Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
03/31/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Credit and Rural Development.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/24/1994Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2159-2160)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/13/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/20/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/20/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/03/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/03/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/03/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/09/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 06/09/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/15/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/08/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/08/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/08/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 08/08/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/08/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/07/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/07/1994
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/13/1994 10/05/1994 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/24/1994 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Environment, Credit and Rural Development03/31/1994 Referred to
07/21/1994 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4129.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4129. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Credit for Rural Business Enterprises

Title II: Credit for Rural Infrastructure

Title III: Credit for Rural Housing

Rural Credit and Development Act of 1994 - Title I: Credit for Rural Business Enterprises - Amends the Farm Credit Act of 1971 to permit farm credit banks and production credit associations to purchase loans and loan interests from non-Farm Credit System institutions.

Enlarges the scope of farm-related business for credit availability purposes.

Authorizes banks for cooperatives to provide loans and other financial services to entities providing certain farm-related services or products under specified conditions.

Title II: Credit for Rural Infrastructure - Authorizes Farm Credit banks to make community facility loans.

Authorizes banks for cooperatives to finance utility-related services.

Title III: Credit for Rural Housing - Enlarges rural housing credit availability by: (1) increasing eligible population areas; (2) increasing farm credit bank and production credit association loan portfolios for non-farmer rural housing loans; and (3) authorizing loans to rural residents for personal, family, or household needs other than housing finance.