Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/13/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/20/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/20/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/03/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/03/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/03/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/09/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 06/09/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/15/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/08/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/08/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/08/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 08/08/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/08/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/07/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/07/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew