Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/12/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/27/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/19/1994