Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/11/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/12/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/20/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/20/1994