Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/10/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/10/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/19/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/19/1994