Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/17/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/04/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/04/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/16/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/16/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/30/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 05/04/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/04/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/04/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 05/18/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/18/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/18/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/25/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/28/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/13/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/13/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 10/13/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/13/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/20/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/26/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/26/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/26/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/27/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/26/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/26/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/26/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/26/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/01/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 02/08/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/18/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/18/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/18/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/13/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/13/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/13/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/28/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/11/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/11/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/11/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/23/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/23/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/26/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/16/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/14/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/14/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/14/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/14/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/14/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/19/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 08/08/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 08/08/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/08/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/09/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/13/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/13/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/22/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/22/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/22/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/22/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/22/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/22/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/22/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/22/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/22/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/22/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/22/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/05/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/05/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/05/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/05/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/05/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/05/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 10/05/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/07/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/29/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/29/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew