Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/14/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/25/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/25/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/25/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/02/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/02/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/09/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/08/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/08/1994