There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

American Indian Religious Freedom Act Amendments of 1994

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American Indian Religious Freedom Act Amendments of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

American Indian Religious Freedom Act Amendments of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the American Indian Religious Freedom Act to provide for the traditional use of peyote by Indians for religious purposes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/06/1994Became Public Law No: 103-344.
10/06/1994Signed by President.
09/30/1994Presented to President.
09/27/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/27/1994Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13433)
08/08/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/05/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-675.
04/14/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
10/06/1994Became Public Law No: 103-344.
10/06/1994Signed by President.
09/30/1994HousePresented to President.
09/28/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/27/1994SenateSenate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13433)
08/09/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
08/08/1994-4:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-4:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/08/1994-4:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/08/1994-4:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7155-7157)
08/08/1994-4:36pmHouseMr. Richardson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/05/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366.
08/05/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-675.
07/27/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/27/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/22/1994HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
07/22/1994HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
06/10/1994HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
04/15/1994HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E686-687)
04/14/1994HouseLate Referral to the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs (Jul 11, 94).
04/14/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/14/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/14/1994 Referred to
07/27/1994 Markup by
08/05/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-675
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs06/10/1994 Hearings by
07/22/1994 Markup by
07/22/1994 Reported by
Senate Indian Affairs08/09/1994 Referred to
09/27/1994 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4230.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/08/1994)

American Indian Religious Freedom Act Amendments of 1994 - Amends the American Indian Religious Freedom Act to permit the traditional use of peyote for Indian religious purposes.

States that this Act shall not prohibit: (1) the Drug Enforcement Agency from reasonably regulating persons who cultivate, harvest, or distribute peyote; and (2) a Federal agency from reasonably limiting peyote use in circumstances of public safety.