Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/20/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/20/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/03/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/03/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/03/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/03/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/11/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/13/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/16/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 06/16/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/22/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/27/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/13/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/13/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/13/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/13/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/27/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/27/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 08/09/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/17/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/05/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/05/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/05/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew