There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Homosexual Discrimination (prohibit it) (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Rights Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit discrimination on account of sexual orientation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/05/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/12/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E621)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/27/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/27/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 01/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/27/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/27/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/27/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/27/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 01/27/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/27/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/27/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 01/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/27/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/27/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/27/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/04/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/04/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/04/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/24/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/11/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/01/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/19/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/19/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/19/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 04/22/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/28/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/06/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/20/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/16/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/27/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/19/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/22/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/26/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/28/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/05/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights02/02/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary01/05/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights02/10/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.431.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.431. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/1993)

Civil Rights Act of 1993 - Makes it unlawful to discriminate on account of a person's sexual orientation in employment, education, credit, housing, the sale or use of goods or services, with respect to any public facility, or in any federally assisted program or activity.