Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/04/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/04/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 06/24/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/26/1994