Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/10/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/10/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/14/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/14/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/17/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/17/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/23/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/21/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/09/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/16/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/12/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/20/1994