Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/17/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 05/17/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/08/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/08/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/08/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/13/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/13/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/13/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/13/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/13/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/13/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/13/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/13/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/13/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/13/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/13/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/14/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/14/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/14/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/14/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/14/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/15/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/15/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/15/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/15/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/16/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/17/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/17/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/17/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 06/17/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/17/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 06/17/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/17/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/17/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/17/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/17/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/17/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/17/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/17/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/17/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/17/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/21/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/21/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/21/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/21/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/21/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/21/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 06/21/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/21/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/21/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/21/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/22/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/22/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/23/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/24/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/28/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/28/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/28/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/28/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 07/12/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 07/18/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/18/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/18/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/18/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/21/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/21/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/26/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/28/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/29/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/03/1994