Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/10/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 06/10/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/14/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/14/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/14/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/14/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/15/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/15/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/15/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/15/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/15/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/17/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/17/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/21/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/21/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/24/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/24/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/24/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/24/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/29/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/29/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 07/13/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/13/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/13/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/13/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/21/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/21/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/21/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/21/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/21/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 07/21/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/04/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/04/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/09/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/09/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/09/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 09/12/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/12/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/12/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/12/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/29/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/29/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/29/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 10/07/1994