Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/16/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/16/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/23/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/23/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 05/24/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/22/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/22/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/28/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/20/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/21/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/22/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/26/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/03/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/05/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/10/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/10/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/12/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 08/18/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/18/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/1994