Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/17/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/17/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/26/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 06/29/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/29/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 07/26/1994