Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/25/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/25/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/14/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/14/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/14/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/14/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/14/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/14/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/03/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/18/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/18/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/26/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/26/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/26/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/26/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/26/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/05/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/05/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/06/1994