Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/10/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/16/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/21/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/21/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/09/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 09/19/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/21/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/21/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/21/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/26/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/28/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/03/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/06/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew