Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/14/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/17/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/28/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/13/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/13/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/19/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/09/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/09/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/10/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/18/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/18/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/20/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 09/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/27/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/30/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 10/04/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/05/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/07/1994