Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/14/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/24/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/29/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/30/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/13/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/29/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/02/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/11/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/30/1994